Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 07/11/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 07/11/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 07/17/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/17/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/17/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/17/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/17/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 08/01/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 08/01/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 08/04/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/04/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 08/04/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/04/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/13/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/13/1995
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 09/13/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/13/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/13/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/13/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/13/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/13/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 09/13/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/13/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/13/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/28/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 09/28/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/28/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/28/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/28/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/28/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/28/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/28/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/28/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/28/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/28/1995
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/28/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/28/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/28/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/28/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/28/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/25/1995
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 10/25/1995
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 10/25/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/25/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 10/25/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/25/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/25/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 10/25/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/09/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 11/09/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/09/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 11/09/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 11/20/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 11/20/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/20/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 12/18/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 12/18/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/18/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 12/18/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/05/1996
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/05/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 01/25/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 01/25/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/01/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 02/27/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 02/27/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/27/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/27/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/27/1996
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/27/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/27/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 03/07/1996
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/21/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/27/1996
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/29/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/16/1996
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 04/16/1996
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 04/16/1996
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/18/1996
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/23/1996
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/23/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/07/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/07/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/07/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/07/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/07/1996
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/15/1996
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/21/1996
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/21/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/21/1996
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/21/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/21/1996
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/22/1996
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 06/12/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 06/12/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/25/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/25/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/25/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/25/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/27/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/27/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/27/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/12/1996
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 07/12/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/12/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/12/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/22/1996
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/22/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/22/1996
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 07/22/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/22/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/22/1996
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/22/1996
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 07/23/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/23/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 07/29/1996
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/29/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/29/1996
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 07/29/1996
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 07/29/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/29/1996
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/29/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/31/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 07/31/1996
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/31/1996
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/31/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 08/02/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 08/02/1996
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/02/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/04/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/04/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/04/1996
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/04/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 09/12/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/12/1996
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/18/1996
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/24/1996
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/25/1996
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/25/1996
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/26/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/26/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/26/1996
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/27/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 10/03/1996