Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 07/11/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 07/11/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/11/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 07/11/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/18/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/18/1995
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/18/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/27/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/27/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 07/28/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/28/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 08/02/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 08/04/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 08/04/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 08/04/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/06/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 09/06/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 09/08/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 10/17/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/08/1995