There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Child Labor Deterrence Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the importation of goods produced abroad with child labor, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/19/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
08/04/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on International Operations and Human Rights.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
07/31/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/19/1995Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/1995Referred to House International Relations
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/1995Referred to the Committee on International Relations, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/19/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 01/24/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 01/24/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/19/1996
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/09/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/12/1996

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations07/19/1995 Referred to
House International Relations Subcommittee on International Operations and Human Rights08/04/1995 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/19/1995 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade07/31/1995 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2065.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2065. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/19/1995)

Child Labor Deterrence Act of 1995 - Urges the President to seek an agreement with governments that trade with the United States to secure an international ban on trade in products of child labor (commercial exploitation of children under 15).

Requires the Secretary of Labor (Secretary) to identify foreign countries that: (1) do not comply with national laws that prohibit child labor in the workplace; (2) utilize child labor in the export of products; and (3) have, on a continuing basis, exported such products to the United States.

Authorizes any person to file a petition with the Secretary requesting that a particular foreign industry and its host country be identified. Requires the Secretary, before making such identification, to: (1) consult with the U.S. Trade Representative, the Secretary of State, the Secretary of Commerce, and the Secretary of the Treasury; (2) hold at least one public hearing for public comment; and (3) publish notice in the Federal Register, inviting public comment, that such identification is being considered.

Prohibits the importation of products which have been produced by child labor.

Sets forth civil and criminal penalties.

Authorizes appropriations for a U.S. contribution to: (1) the International Labor Organization for the activities of the International Program on the Elimination of Child Labor; and (2) the United Nations Commission on Human Rights for those activities relating to bonded child labor that are carried out by the Subcommittee and Working Group on Contemporary Forms of Slavery.