Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9]* 07/19/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/27/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/04/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/06/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/13/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 09/13/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/13/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 09/13/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/13/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/13/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/14/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/20/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/20/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 09/20/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/27/1995
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 09/29/1995

Show cosponsors who withdrew