Committees: H.R.2076 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations02/06/1995 Referred to
07/19/1995 Markup by
07/19/1995 Reported original measure H. Rept. 104-196
House Appropriations Subcommittee on Commerce, Justice, State, and Judiciary02/06/1995 Referred to
05/24/1995 Hearings by
06/28/1995 Markup by
06/28/1995 Reported by
Senate Appropriations07/27/1995 Referred to
09/12/1995 Markup by
09/12/1995 Reported by S. Rept. 104-139
Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Commerce, Justice, State, and the Judiciary09/07/1995 Markup by
09/07/1995 Reported by