Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 01/11/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/11/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/11/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/11/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 01/11/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/11/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 01/11/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/11/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 01/11/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/11/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 01/18/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 01/18/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/18/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/18/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/18/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 01/18/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/18/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/25/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/25/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/25/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 01/25/1995
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/01/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 02/01/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/01/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/22/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/22/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/03/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/03/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/03/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/12/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/12/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/27/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/15/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew