There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Private Security Officer Quality Assurance Act of 1996

Short Titles as Introduced

Private Security Officer Quality Assurance Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To expedite State reviews of criminal records of applicants for private security officer employment, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/26/1996Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 6 (Roll no. 437).
09/24/1996Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 104-827, Part I.
07/21/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/26/1996SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/26/1996-12:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/1996-12:24pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 6 (Roll no. 437).
09/26/1996-12:12pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H11245-11246)
09/25/1996-7:56pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed until Sept. 26.
09/25/1996-7:47pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
09/25/1996-7:47pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11135-11137)
09/25/1996-7:46pmHouseMr. Barr moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/24/1996HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 104-827, Part I.
09/18/1996HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/18/1996HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/11/1996HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/21/1996HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime
03/21/1996HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime
03/07/1996HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime
08/04/1995HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations.
Action By: Committee on Economic and Educational Opportunities
07/28/1995HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/21/1995HouseReferred to the Committee on Economic and Educational Opportunities, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/21/1995HouseReferred to the Committee on Economic and Educational Opportunities, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/21/1995HouseReferred to the Committee on Economic and Educational Opportunities, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/21/1995HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 07/21/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 07/21/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 07/21/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/21/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/21/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/19/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/19/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/19/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/19/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/19/1995
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 09/19/1995
Resident Commissioner Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 09/19/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/19/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/19/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 09/19/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/19/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 09/19/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/12/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/12/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 10/12/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/12/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/12/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/12/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/12/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 10/12/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/12/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/24/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/24/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 01/24/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/24/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/24/1996
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/24/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/24/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/10/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/10/1996
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 07/21/1995 07/27/1995 --

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Economic and Educational Opportunities07/21/1995 Referred to
House Economic and Educational Opportunities Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations08/04/1995 Referred to
House Judiciary07/21/1995 Referred to
09/18/1996 Markup by
09/24/1996 Reported by H. Rept. 104-827
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime07/28/1995 Referred to
03/07/1996 Hearings by
03/21/1996 Markup by
03/21/1996 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.2092.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2092. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/26/1996)

Private Security Officer Quality Assurance Act of 1996 - Authorizes an association of employers of private security officers (officers) to submit fingerprints or other methods of positive identification to the Attorney General for background checks of such officers. Allows the Attorney General to: (1) exchange identification and criminal history records with State governmental agencies for licensing and employment purposes; and (2) prescribe regulations to carry out this Act, including measures relating to the imposition of fees necessary for the recovery of costs.

Expresses the sense of the Congress that States should participate in the background check system established under this Act.