Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 07/21/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 07/21/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 07/21/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/21/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/21/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/19/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/19/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/19/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/19/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/19/1995
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 09/19/1995
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 09/19/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/19/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/19/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 09/19/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/19/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 09/19/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/12/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/12/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 10/12/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/12/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/12/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/12/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/12/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 10/12/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/12/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/24/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/24/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 01/24/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/24/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/24/1996
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/24/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/24/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/10/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/10/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew