Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/21/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/27/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/27/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/27/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/27/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 09/27/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/27/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/27/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/27/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/27/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/28/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 09/28/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/28/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/28/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/28/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/28/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/29/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/29/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 10/10/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/10/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/10/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/25/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 10/25/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/30/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/30/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/30/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 10/30/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 10/31/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 10/31/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/31/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/31/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 11/01/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 11/01/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 11/01/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 11/02/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 11/07/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 11/09/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 11/13/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/15/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 12/14/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 01/30/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/30/1996
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 02/28/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/28/1996
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/06/1996