Committees: H.R.2099 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Appropriations02/06/1995 Referred to
07/18/1995 Markup by
07/21/1995 Reported original measure H. Rept. 104-201
House Appropriations Subcommittee on VA, HUD, and Independent Agencies02/06/1995 Referred to
05/24/1995 Hearings by
07/18/1995 Markup by
07/18/1995 Reported by
Senate Appropriations08/01/1995 Referred to
09/13/1995 Markup by
09/13/1995 Reported by S. Rept. 104-140
Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on VA, HUD, and Independent Agencies09/11/1995 Markup by
09/11/1995 Reported by