Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/27/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/27/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/27/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 07/27/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 08/04/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 08/04/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 08/04/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 08/04/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 08/04/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/28/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 11/08/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/08/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 11/08/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 01/23/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 01/23/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 01/23/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/23/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/23/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/29/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/29/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/29/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/29/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/23/1996
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/23/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/13/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/13/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 08/02/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 08/02/1996