Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 07/28/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large]* 07/28/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/12/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/28/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/28/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/28/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/28/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/30/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/30/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 11/10/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/10/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/30/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/28/1996
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/28/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/28/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/28/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/28/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/28/1996
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/28/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/28/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/28/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/28/1996
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/28/1996
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/28/1996
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/28/1996
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 02/28/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/28/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 02/28/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/28/1996
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/28/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 02/28/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 02/28/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 04/25/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/25/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 04/25/1996
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/25/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/13/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 07/10/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 08/02/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/10/1996