Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 07/31/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/31/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 08/03/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 08/03/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 09/06/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/06/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/06/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/06/1995
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 09/18/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/27/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/11/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 10/11/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/19/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/26/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 12/30/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 01/05/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/20/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/20/1996
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/20/1996
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/20/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/20/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 03/05/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/29/1996
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/29/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/16/1996
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/09/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/10/1996