Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 09/06/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/06/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/06/1995
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 09/06/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/06/1995
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 09/06/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/06/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/06/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/06/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/14/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/14/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/14/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/14/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/14/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/14/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 09/20/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/20/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/20/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/20/1995
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 09/20/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 10/18/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 10/18/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 11/29/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/09/1996
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/30/1996