Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 07/31/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 08/04/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 08/04/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 08/04/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 09/06/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/06/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/06/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/06/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/06/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/28/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/28/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/28/1995
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 11/20/1995