There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Vancouver National Historic Reserve Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the Vancouver National Historic Reserve, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
08/02/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
10/28/1996For Further Action See H.R.4236.
10/31/1995Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Lands
10/31/1995Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Lands
09/07/1995Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Lands
08/09/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Lands.
Action By: Committee on Resources
08/02/1995Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/02/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 09/20/1995

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources08/02/1995 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Lands08/09/1995 Referred to
09/07/1995 Hearings by
10/31/1995 Markup by
10/31/1995 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2172. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/02/1995)

Vancouver National Historic Reserve Act of 1995 - Establishes the Vancouver National Historic Reserve in the State of Washington.

(Sec. 5) Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior (Secretary), acting through the Director of the National Park Service, and the Secretary of the Army to participate as members of the Vancouver National Historic Reserve Partnership to oversee the protection, enhancement, and development of the Reserve. Requires the Partnership to: (1) act as a forum for cooperation and coordination among the member agencies; (2) minimize staffing, development, and operational costs to each member agency; (3) promote the coordinated protection, use, and interpretation of the cultural, recreational, and educational resources of the Reserve; (4) identify additional opportunities for appropriate public use and enjoyment of the Reserve; and (5) develop and coordinate implementation of the management plan, including the Pearson Airpark economic viability and mitigation plan, and an interpretive plan for the Reserve pursuant to this Act.

Requires the Partnership to: (1) be comprised of a representative of each of the National Park Service, the Historic Preservation Office of the State of Washington, the Department of the Army, the city of Vancouver, and the citizens of Washington State; and (2) prepare and submit to the Secretary for review and approval a cooperative agreement, prepared with public participation, to govern the operations of the Partnership.

(Sec. 8) Requires the Partnership to: (1) develop and submit a management plan for the Reserve to the Secretary for review and approval; and (2) as appropriate, submit a revised plan to the Secretary upon evaluating the progress made in implementing the original one. Allows the Partnership to enter into a memorandum of agreement with a State, a political subdivision, or a private person or organization that, at a minimum, establishes procedures for providing notice to the Partnership of actions proposed by such entity that may affect implementation of the management plan.

(Sec. 9) Permits general aviation at Pearson Airpark that is permitted to be conducted on National Park Service (NPS) property on the enactment of this Act to continue after the year 2002, provided that: (1) Pearson AirField and Air Museum shall be operated by the city of Vancouver; (2) Vancouver pays the NPS a fee of $1 per year for the continued use and occupancy of the Airpark on NPS property and the appraised fair market land rental value of the portion of such property that is used for development of the Pearson Airpark Historical Museum; (3) all nonhistoric, aviation-related facilities and equipment shall be removed by Vancouver from NPS property by April 6, 2003, except those necessary for navigation and safety; (4) Vancouver shall not be compensated for historic aviation-related facilities or equipment remaining on NPS property, but shall be liable and responsible for continued use and maintenance of such facilities and equipment; (5) approval of the Secretary is required for all improvements and additions to facilities or equipment of the Air Museum located on NPS property; (6) helicopters shall not be based at Pearson Airpark except as necessary to accommodate emergency, disaster, or national security needs; and (7) the number of airworthy aircraft based at the Airpark shall be determined under the Pearson economic plan.

Requires the Partnership to prepare and include in the management plan an economic viability and mitigation plan for the Pearson Airpark.

(Sec. 10) Authorizes the Secretary to provide financial and technical assistance in preparing, developing, and implementing the management plan.

(Sec. 12) Authorizes appropriations. Limits the Federal share of the costs of Partnership activities in a fiscal year to 50 percent.