Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 01/09/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/11/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 01/11/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 01/11/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/11/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 01/13/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 01/17/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 01/18/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 01/19/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 01/19/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 01/20/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 01/20/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/23/1995
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 01/24/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 01/24/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 01/24/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 01/24/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/24/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 01/25/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/25/1995
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 01/26/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/26/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 01/26/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/27/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/01/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/02/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/03/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/06/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 02/06/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/07/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/08/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/09/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 02/09/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/13/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/13/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/27/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/02/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/06/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/10/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 03/22/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/23/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/28/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/29/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/04/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/06/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/18/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/22/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/22/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/22/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/25/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/25/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/25/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/25/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/25/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/07/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/07/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 06/07/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 06/13/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/13/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/16/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/16/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/20/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/22/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/28/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 06/30/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/10/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/11/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/12/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/17/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/18/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 08/04/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/06/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/13/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 09/13/1995
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/13/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 09/13/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 10/11/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 10/17/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/24/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/30/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/07/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 12/07/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 12/07/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 12/07/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 12/07/1995
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4] 12/07/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/07/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 12/07/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 01/23/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 01/23/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 01/23/1996
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/23/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 01/24/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 01/30/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 01/30/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 02/01/1996
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1] 03/05/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/19/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/19/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/19/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/26/1996
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/26/1996
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/15/1996
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/17/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/30/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/10/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/14/1996
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/14/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 05/21/1996
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/21/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/11/1996
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 07/22/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/22/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/24/1996
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/12/1996
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/12/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/12/1996
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/26/1996
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 09/27/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/04/1996