Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/27/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/27/1995
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 09/27/1995
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/27/1995
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 09/27/1995
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 09/27/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/27/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/27/1995
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 09/27/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 09/27/1995
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/27/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/27/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/27/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/27/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/10/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 10/10/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 10/10/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/10/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/09/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/09/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 11/09/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/09/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 11/09/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 11/09/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/09/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 11/09/1995
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 11/30/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/30/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 11/30/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 01/03/1996
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/03/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/27/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/05/1996
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/21/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/21/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/21/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/21/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/21/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/21/1996
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 03/21/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 03/29/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 03/29/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/29/1996
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/29/1996
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/29/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/29/1996
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 04/23/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/23/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/23/1996
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/23/1996
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/23/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/05/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/05/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/05/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/05/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/05/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/05/1996
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/31/1996