Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 09/12/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/12/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/12/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/12/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/12/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/12/1995
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/12/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/12/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/12/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/12/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/12/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/12/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 09/12/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/12/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/12/1995
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 09/12/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/12/1995
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/12/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/12/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/12/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/12/1995
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 09/12/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/12/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 09/12/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 09/12/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 09/12/1995
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/12/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/12/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 09/13/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/13/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/13/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/13/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/14/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 09/14/1995
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/14/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/14/1995
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 09/14/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/14/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 09/19/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/19/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 09/19/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 09/19/1995
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/19/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/19/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/19/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/19/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 09/27/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/27/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 09/27/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/27/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/27/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/27/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/27/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/27/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/27/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 09/27/1995
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/27/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/27/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/27/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/27/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/28/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/28/1995
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 09/28/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/28/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 09/28/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/28/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/28/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 09/28/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/28/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/11/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/11/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/11/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/11/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/11/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/11/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/11/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/11/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 10/11/1995
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/11/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/11/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/11/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 10/11/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 10/11/1995
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 10/11/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/12/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/12/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/12/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/12/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 10/12/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 10/18/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/18/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 10/18/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/18/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 10/18/1995
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 10/18/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/18/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 10/18/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 10/18/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/25/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 10/25/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 10/25/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/25/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 10/25/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/25/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/25/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/25/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/25/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 11/01/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 11/01/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/01/1995
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 11/01/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 11/01/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 11/01/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 11/01/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 11/01/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/10/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 11/10/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/10/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 11/10/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/10/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 12/05/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 12/05/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 12/05/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 12/05/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/19/1995
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 01/31/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 01/31/1996
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 01/31/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/28/1996
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 02/28/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 02/28/1996
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/07/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/07/1996
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 03/07/1996
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 03/13/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/13/1996
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 03/13/1996
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/20/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/28/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/28/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/28/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 03/28/1996
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 05/01/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/01/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/14/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/14/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/22/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/22/1996
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 06/05/1996
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/05/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/05/1996
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/18/1996
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 06/18/1996
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/26/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 06/26/1996
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/04/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/04/1996