Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 08/04/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 09/13/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/13/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/19/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 09/19/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/28/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 10/19/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 12/13/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 12/19/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 01/04/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 01/05/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 01/24/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/28/1996
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/28/1996
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 02/28/1996
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 02/28/1996
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 03/05/1996
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/05/1996
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 03/06/1996
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/06/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 03/06/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew