Text: H.R.2204 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 104-64 (12/18/1995)

 
[104th Congress Public Law 64]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


<DOC>
[DOCID: f:publ64.104]


[[Page 109 STAT. 689]]

Public Law 104-64
104th Congress

                                 An Act


 
 To extend and reauthorize the Defense Production Act of 1950, and for 
         other purposes. <<NOTE: Dec. 18, 1995 -  [H.R. 2204]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: Defense 
Production Act Amendments of 1995.>> 

SECTION 1. <<NOTE: 50 USC app. 2061 note.>> SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Defense Production Act Amendments of 
1995''.

SEC. 2. EXTENSION OF PROGRAMS.

    Section 717(a) of the Defense Production Act of 1950 (50 U.S.C. App. 
2166(a)) is amended in the first sentence by striking ``Title I (except 
section 104), title III, and title VII (except sections 708, 714, 719, 
and 721) of this Act, and all authority conferred thereunder shall 
terminate at the close of September 30, 1995'' and inserting ``Title I 
(except section 104), title III, and title VII (except sections 708 and 
721), and all authority conferred thereunder, shall terminate at the 
close of September 30, 1998''.

SEC. 3. AUTHORIZING APPROPRIATIONS FOR TITLE III PROJECTS.

    Section 711 of the Defense Production Act of 1950 (50 U.S.C. App. 
2161) is amended--
            (1) in subsection (a), by striking ``(a) Authori-
        zation.--'' and all that follows through ``subsection (c),,'' 
        and inserting ``(a) Authorization.--Except as provided in 
        subsection (b),''; and
            (2) by striking subsections (b), (c), and (d) and inserting 
        after subsection (a) the following new subsection:

    ``(b) Title III Authorization.--There are authorized to be 
appropriated for each of the fiscal years 1996, 1997, and 1998, such 
sums as may be necessary to carry out title III.''.

SEC. 4. <<NOTE: President. 50 USC app. 2062 note.>> REPORTS TO THE 
            CONGRESS.

    (a) In General.--The President shall prepare and transmit to the 
Committee on Banking and Financial Services of the House of 
Representatives and the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs 
of the Senate an interim report and a final report on proposed 
legislative modernization of the authorities contained in the Defense 
Production Act of 1950.

[[Page 109 STAT. 690]]

    (b) Timing.--The President shall so transmit--
            (1) the interim report required by subsection (a), not later 
        than January 31, 1997; and
            (2) the final report required by subsection (a), not later 
        than September 30, 1997.

    Approved December 18, 1995.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 2204 (S. 1147):
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

SENATE REPORTS: No. 104-134 accompanying S. 1147 (Comm. on Banking, 
Housing, and Urban Affairs).
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 141 (1995):
            Sept. 28, S. 1147 considered and passed Senate.
            Nov. 13, H.R. 2204 considered and passed House.
            Dec. 5, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>