Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/30/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/30/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/30/1995
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 11/30/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 11/30/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/30/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 12/13/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/01/1996
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 02/01/1996
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/22/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/18/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/18/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/18/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/24/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/24/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/24/1996
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/24/1996
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/24/1996
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/25/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 06/25/1996
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 06/25/1996
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/25/1996
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/26/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/26/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/26/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/27/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/27/1996
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/27/1996
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/27/1996
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 06/27/1996
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/27/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/27/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/27/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/27/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/09/1996
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/09/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/09/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/09/1996
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/09/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/09/1996
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/09/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/09/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/09/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/09/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/09/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/09/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/09/1996
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 07/09/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 07/11/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/11/1996
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/11/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/11/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/11/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/11/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/11/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/11/1996
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/11/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/11/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/11/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 07/11/1996
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 07/12/1996
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/12/1996
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/16/1996
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 07/16/1996
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 07/18/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 07/18/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/18/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/25/1996
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/25/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/25/1996
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/25/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/25/1996
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 07/25/1996
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 07/25/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/04/1996
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/04/1996
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/04/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/04/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/04/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 09/10/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/10/1996
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/20/1996