Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 10/18/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/18/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/18/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/18/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/18/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 10/18/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 12/13/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 12/13/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 12/13/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/07/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/07/1996
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 03/07/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/07/1996
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/07/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 03/07/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/07/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/23/1996
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/23/1996
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/23/1996
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/23/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/23/1996
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/23/1996