Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/06/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/06/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/06/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/06/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/06/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/06/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/06/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/20/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/16/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/16/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/16/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/16/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/16/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/16/1996
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/16/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/25/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/25/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/25/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 08/02/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/02/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 08/02/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 08/02/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/02/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/02/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 08/02/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/28/1996