Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/14/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/14/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/14/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/14/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 09/14/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/14/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 09/14/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/14/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/14/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 09/14/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 09/14/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/14/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/27/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/29/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/29/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/29/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/11/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/11/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/11/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/11/1995
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 10/11/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/11/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/11/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/11/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/17/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/17/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/17/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/24/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/24/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 10/24/1995
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 10/24/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/24/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/26/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/26/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/26/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 10/26/1995
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/31/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 11/13/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/13/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/16/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 11/29/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/04/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/27/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/27/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/27/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/27/1996
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/27/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/27/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/27/1996
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/28/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/28/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 03/07/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 03/07/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/07/1996
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/28/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/15/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/29/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/29/1996
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/22/1996