There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Congressional Pension Forfeiture Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 5, United States Code, to provide for the forfeiture of retirement benefits in the case of any Member or employee of Congress who is convicted of an offense relating to the official duties of that individual.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
08/04/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
08/10/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform and Oversight
08/04/1995Referred to House Oversight
Action By: House of Representatives
08/04/1995Referred to House Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
08/04/1995Referred to the Committee on House Oversight, and in addition to the Committee on Government Reform and Oversight, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/04/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 08/04/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/14/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/14/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 09/14/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/21/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 10/12/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 10/12/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/12/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/12/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/12/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/12/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 10/12/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/12/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/12/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 10/12/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/12/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/12/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/12/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/12/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 10/19/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 10/19/1995
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 10/19/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/19/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 10/19/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/19/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 11/07/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 11/07/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 11/08/1995
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/08/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 11/17/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 12/18/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 04/15/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/18/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/30/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/01/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/07/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 05/07/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/07/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/07/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/07/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/10/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/10/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/14/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/14/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/21/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/29/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/11/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 06/11/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/19/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/27/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 07/10/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/10/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/25/1996
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 08/02/1996

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform and Oversight08/04/1995 Referred to
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Civil Service08/10/1995 Referred to
House Oversight08/04/1995 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2244.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2244. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/04/1995)

Congressional Pension Forfeiture Act - Prohibits an individual or his or her survivor or beneficiary from being paid annuity or retired pay on the basis of the individual's creditable service if the individual is convicted of committing, while an employee or Member of Congress, one of specified offenses relating to his or her duties of office which is punishable by imprisonment for more than one year, including bribery of public officials, representing others in claims against the Government, and making or receiving expenditures to influence voting.

Applies the same prohibition to such an individual who: (1) is under indictment after the enactment of this Act for one of the offenses; or (2) willfully remains outside the United States or its territories and possessions for more than one year with knowledge of the indictment or charge.

Prohibits interest from being computed on an individual's refund of contributions and deposits paid toward annuity or retired pay if such individual was convicted of such an offense in this Act for the period after the conviction of the violation.