Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 08/04/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 08/04/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/14/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/14/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 09/14/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/21/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 10/12/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 10/12/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/12/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/12/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/12/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/12/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 10/12/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/12/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/12/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 10/12/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/12/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/12/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/12/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/12/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 10/19/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 10/19/1995
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 10/19/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/19/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 10/19/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/19/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 11/07/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 11/07/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 11/08/1995
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/08/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 11/17/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 12/18/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 04/15/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/18/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/30/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/01/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/07/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 05/07/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/07/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/07/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/07/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/10/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/10/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/14/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/14/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/21/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/29/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/11/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 06/11/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/19/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/27/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 07/10/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/10/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/25/1996
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 08/02/1996