There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the regulation of any tobacco products, or tobacco sponsored advertising, used or purchased by the National Association of Stock Car Automobile Racing, its agents or affiliates, or any other professional motor sports association by the Secretary of Health and Human Services or any other instrumentality of the Federal Government.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/06/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
09/18/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
09/18/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
09/08/1995Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8712)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/06/1995Referred to the House Committee on Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/06/1995Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8543)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/06/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 09/06/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 09/06/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/07/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 09/07/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/07/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/07/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 09/07/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/07/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 09/07/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/18/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 09/18/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/18/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 09/21/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/21/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/21/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 09/21/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/27/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/27/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/11/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/11/1995
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/11/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 10/18/1995
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 10/18/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/18/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/18/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/29/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 12/11/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 12/19/1995

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce09/06/1995 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment09/18/1995 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade, and Hazardous Materials09/18/1995 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2265.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2265. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/06/1995)

Prohibits the Secretary of Health and Human Services and any other Federal official from: (1) regulating the use of tobacco or tobacco products by the National Association of Stock Car Automobile Racing or other professional motor sports association under the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act; and (2) taking any action with respect to tobacco, tobacco products, or tobacco advertising used by such associations under the Federal Cigarette Labeling and Advertising Act or the Comprehensive Smokeless Tobacco Health and Education Act of 1986.