Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 09/06/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 09/06/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/07/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 09/07/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/07/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/07/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 09/07/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/07/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 09/07/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/18/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 09/18/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/18/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 09/21/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/21/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/21/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 09/21/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/27/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/27/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/11/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/11/1995
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/11/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 10/18/1995
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 10/18/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/18/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/18/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/29/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 12/11/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 12/19/1995