Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/20/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/20/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/20/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/20/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/20/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 09/20/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/20/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/27/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 09/27/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/27/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 10/10/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/10/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/10/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/10/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 10/10/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/18/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 10/18/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 10/18/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 10/25/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 10/25/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/25/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/07/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 11/07/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 11/07/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 12/07/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 12/07/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 12/07/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/22/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 01/22/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/22/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/22/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/31/1996
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/01/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/01/1996
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/09/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/09/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/09/1996
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/09/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/23/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/05/1996
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/06/1996
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 03/06/1996
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/12/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/13/1996
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/18/1996
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 03/21/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/22/1996
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/26/1996
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/27/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 04/15/1996
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/15/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/16/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/23/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 04/25/1996
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 04/30/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/02/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/07/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 05/07/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/09/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/09/1996
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/09/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/09/1996
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/09/1996
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/09/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/10/1996
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/10/1996
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/10/1996
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 05/10/1996
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/10/1996
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/15/1996
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 05/15/1996
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/15/1996
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 05/15/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/15/1996
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/15/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/15/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/15/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/15/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/20/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 05/23/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/23/1996
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/29/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 06/04/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/05/1996
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 06/18/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/24/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/27/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/27/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/08/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/09/1996
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/11/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/17/1996
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 07/17/1996
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 07/18/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 07/23/1996
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/25/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/30/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/31/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/05/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/10/1996