Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 09/07/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 09/07/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 09/07/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 09/07/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/07/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/14/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 09/14/1995
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 09/14/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/14/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/14/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/14/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/14/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/14/1995
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 09/14/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/14/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 09/14/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/14/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 09/14/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 09/14/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/14/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/14/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 09/14/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/14/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/14/1995
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 09/14/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/14/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 09/14/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/28/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 09/28/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/28/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 10/18/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 10/18/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/28/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/28/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 11/28/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/22/1996
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/22/1996
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/22/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew