Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 09/07/1995
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 10/19/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/19/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 10/19/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/19/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 10/19/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/19/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 10/19/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/19/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 10/19/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/19/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 10/19/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 10/19/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/19/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 10/19/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/19/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/25/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 10/25/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 10/25/1995
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/30/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/30/1995
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 10/30/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/31/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 10/31/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 11/01/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 11/08/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/13/1995
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/20/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 12/05/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 12/05/1995
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/11/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/04/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/22/1996
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 01/22/1996
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 01/22/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/23/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/24/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/06/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/27/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/27/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/07/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/07/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/07/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/07/1996