Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 09/14/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/14/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 09/14/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/14/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/14/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/14/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/14/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/14/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 09/14/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/28/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/28/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/28/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/28/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/28/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/28/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/28/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/12/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/13/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 11/13/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 11/14/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 11/14/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 11/14/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 11/14/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/16/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/16/1995
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 11/16/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/16/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 11/16/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/16/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/16/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 11/16/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/20/1995
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 11/20/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 11/20/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/20/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/14/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 12/14/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 01/24/1996
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 01/24/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/24/1996
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 01/24/1996
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 01/24/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/01/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew