Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large]* 09/12/1995
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/27/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/27/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 10/12/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/12/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/09/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/18/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 11/18/1995
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 11/18/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 11/18/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 11/18/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/18/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/18/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/18/1995
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 11/18/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/18/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 11/18/1995
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/18/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 11/18/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 11/18/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/18/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/18/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 11/20/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 11/20/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/20/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/20/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/20/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 11/30/1995
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 11/30/1995
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4] 11/30/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 12/07/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 12/15/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/15/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 01/03/1996
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 01/03/1996
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 01/03/1996
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 01/03/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 01/03/1996
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 01/03/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 01/31/1996