Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 10/19/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/19/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 10/19/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/19/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/19/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/19/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/19/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/19/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/19/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/19/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 10/19/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 10/19/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/19/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 10/19/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 10/19/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/19/1995
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 10/19/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 10/19/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/19/1995
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/19/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/19/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/19/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 10/19/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/19/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/19/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 10/19/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/19/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/19/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/19/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 10/19/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 10/19/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 11/30/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 11/30/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 11/30/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/30/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 11/30/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/30/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/30/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/30/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/30/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/30/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/30/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 11/30/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 11/30/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 11/30/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/30/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 11/30/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 11/30/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 11/30/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 11/30/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/07/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 12/07/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 12/07/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 12/07/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/07/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 12/07/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 12/07/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/07/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/25/1996
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 01/25/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/25/1996
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/25/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/25/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/13/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/13/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 02/13/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/13/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/23/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/23/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 02/29/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/29/1996
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/29/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/29/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/29/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 02/29/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/29/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 02/29/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/29/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/29/1996
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 02/29/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 02/29/1996
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 02/29/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/05/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/05/1996
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/05/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/05/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/05/1996
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 03/05/1996
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 03/05/1996
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/05/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/05/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/05/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/13/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/13/1996
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/13/1996
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/13/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/13/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/13/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/13/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/13/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/13/1996
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 03/13/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/13/1996
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/20/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/20/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/20/1996
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/20/1996
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/20/1996
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/20/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/20/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/20/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 03/28/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/28/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/28/1996
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/28/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/28/1996
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 03/28/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/28/1996
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/18/1996
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/18/1996
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/18/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/18/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 04/18/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/25/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 04/25/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/25/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/25/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 04/30/1996
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/30/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/30/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 04/30/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/30/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 04/30/1996
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/30/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/08/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/08/1996
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/08/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/14/1996
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/14/1996
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 05/14/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/22/1996
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 05/22/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/22/1996
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/22/1996
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/22/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/23/1996
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/23/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/23/1996
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/30/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/30/1996
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/30/1996
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/30/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/11/1996
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/11/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/11/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/20/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/20/1996
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/20/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 07/10/1996
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 07/24/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/31/1996