Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/13/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/21/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/21/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/21/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/21/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 09/21/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/21/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/21/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/27/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/27/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/29/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/29/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/29/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 10/10/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/10/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/10/1995
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/10/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/10/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 10/10/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/18/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/18/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 10/18/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 10/19/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 10/19/1995
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 10/19/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/19/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/26/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 11/16/1995
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 12/12/1995