There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Distilled Spirits Tax Payment Simplification Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to simplify the method of payment of taxes on distilled spirits.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/14/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
09/14/1995Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/14/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 09/14/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/25/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 10/12/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/12/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/12/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 10/12/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 10/12/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/25/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/25/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/25/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/25/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 11/07/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 11/07/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/07/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/14/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 11/14/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/06/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 12/06/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 12/06/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 12/06/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 12/06/1995
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 12/06/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 12/15/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 12/15/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/03/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 01/03/1996
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 01/03/1996
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 01/03/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/03/1996
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 01/03/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/03/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/03/1996
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/28/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 02/28/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/28/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/28/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 02/28/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/28/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/28/1996
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 02/28/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [R-TX-14] 02/29/1996
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/29/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/06/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [R-LA-7] 03/06/1996
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/06/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/13/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/13/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/19/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/19/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 05/02/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/02/1996
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/02/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/02/1996
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/02/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/13/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/13/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/18/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/09/1996

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/14/1995 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (20)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2333. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/14/1995)

Distilled Spirits Tax Payment Simplification Act of 1995 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to modify or impose requirements regarding: (1) the transfer of distilled spirits between bonded premises and between importation and bonded premises; (2) operations as a bonded dealer conducted on the bonded premises of a distilled spirits plant; (3) establishment and operation of such a plant by a bonded dealer; (4) election to be treated as a bonded dealer; (5) the time at which the tax on distilled spirits is determined; (6) distilled spirits lost or destroyed in bond or returned to bonded premises; (7) the time for tax payment and payment by electronic transfer; and (8) application to a plant used by a bonded dealer of provisions relating to sales by proprietors of controlled premises.