Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 09/14/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/25/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 10/12/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/12/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/12/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 10/12/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 10/12/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/25/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/25/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/25/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/25/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 11/07/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 11/07/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/07/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/14/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 11/14/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/06/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 12/06/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 12/06/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 12/06/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 12/06/1995
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 12/06/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 12/15/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 12/15/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/03/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 01/03/1996
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 01/03/1996
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 01/03/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/03/1996
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 01/03/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/03/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/03/1996
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/28/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 02/28/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/28/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 02/28/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 02/28/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/28/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/28/1996
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 02/28/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 02/29/1996
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/29/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/06/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 03/06/1996
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/06/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/13/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/13/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/19/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/19/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 05/02/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/02/1996
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/02/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/02/1996
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/02/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/13/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/13/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/18/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/09/1996