Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 09/14/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 09/14/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/14/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 09/14/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 09/14/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 09/14/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 09/14/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9]* 09/14/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9]* 09/14/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 09/14/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 09/14/1995
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 09/14/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/14/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/07/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 11/07/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/07/1995
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 11/07/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/07/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 11/07/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 11/07/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 11/07/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 11/07/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 11/07/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 11/07/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 11/07/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 12/15/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 12/15/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 12/15/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 12/15/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/15/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 12/15/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 12/15/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 12/15/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 12/15/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/15/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 12/15/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 12/15/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/15/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 01/30/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/30/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/30/1996
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 01/30/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 01/30/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 01/30/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 01/30/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/28/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/28/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/28/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/28/1996
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/28/1996
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/28/1996
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/17/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 04/17/1996
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/17/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/17/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/17/1996
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/17/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/17/1996
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/17/1996
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/17/1996
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/17/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/17/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/09/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/09/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/09/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/09/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/09/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/09/1996
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 05/09/1996
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 05/09/1996
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 05/09/1996
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/09/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/09/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/09/1996
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/09/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/09/1996
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/09/1996
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 06/11/1996
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/11/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/11/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/11/1996
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 06/11/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/11/1996
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/11/1996
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/11/1996
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/11/1996
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/11/1996
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/11/1996