Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 09/14/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 09/19/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 09/19/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/19/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/19/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/19/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/19/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/28/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 09/28/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/28/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/28/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/29/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 09/29/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/11/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/11/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/18/1995
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 10/18/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 10/18/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 10/25/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 10/25/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 10/25/1995
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 10/25/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 11/07/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 11/07/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 11/07/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 11/13/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 11/13/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 11/13/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 12/13/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 12/13/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/31/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/06/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/23/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/08/1996
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/08/1996
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/16/1996
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 05/22/1996
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 05/22/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/25/1996