Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 09/21/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/21/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 09/21/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 09/21/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 09/21/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 09/21/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/27/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 09/27/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 09/27/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/11/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 10/11/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/11/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/17/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/17/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 01/24/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 01/25/1996