Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 11/20/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 11/20/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 11/20/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 11/20/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/20/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 11/20/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 11/20/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/23/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/23/1996
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 02/23/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/23/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/23/1996
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/23/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/23/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/23/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/28/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/28/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 03/14/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/14/1996
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/14/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/14/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/29/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/29/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/16/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/25/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/25/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/08/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/08/1996
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 05/08/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/21/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/21/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 06/10/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/10/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 06/19/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 06/19/1996
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/20/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/20/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/20/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 06/20/1996
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/20/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/26/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/26/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 06/26/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/26/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/11/1996