There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 1995

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 1995

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To increase, effective as of December 1, 1995, the rates of compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for the survivors of certain disabled veterans.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
11/22/1995Became Public Law No: 104-57. (TXT | PDF)
11/22/1995Signed by President.
11/12/1995Presented to President.
11/10/1995Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(consideration: CR H12124)
11/09/1995Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/09/1995Senate Committee on Veterans discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/10/1995Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
10/06/1995Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 104-273.
09/25/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/22/1995Became Public Law No: 104-57. (TXT | PDF)
11/22/1995Signed by President.
11/12/1995HousePresented to President.
11/10/1995-3:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/10/1995-3:36pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H12124)
11/10/1995-3:34pmHouseMr. Stump asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment.
11/10/1995SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/09/1995SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/09/1995SenateS.Amdt.3054 Amendment SP 3054 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
11/09/1995SenateAmendment SP 3054 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
11/09/1995SenateS.Amdt.3054 Proposed by Senator Lott for Senator Simpson. To propose a substitute.
11/09/1995SenateAmendment SP 3054 proposed by Senator Lott for Senator Simpson.
11/09/1995SenateMeasure laid before Senate. (consideration: CR S16937-16939)
11/09/1995SenateSenate Committee on Veterans discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/11/1995SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
10/10/1995-3:38pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/10/1995-3:38pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
10/10/1995-3:30pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/10/1995-3:30pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9762-9764)
10/10/1995-3:29pmHouseMr. Stump moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/06/1995HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 142.
10/06/1995HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 104-273.
09/28/1995HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/28/1995HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/25/1995HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
09/25/1995HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 09/25/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 09/25/1995

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs09/25/1995 Referred to
09/28/1995 Markup by
10/06/1995 Reported by H. Rept. 104-273
Senate Veterans' Affairs10/11/1995 Referred to
11/09/1995 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.2394.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2394. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (11/09/1995)

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 1995 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to increase, as of December 1, 1995, the rates of veterans' disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled adult children, dependency and indemnity compensation (DIC) for surviving spouses and children, and additional DIC for surviving spouses with minor children.

Requires each such increase to be the same percentage as the increase in benefits provided under title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act, on the same effective date. Requires resulting amounts that are not even multiples of $1 to be rounded to the next lower whole dollar.

Requires the Secretary to publish such increases in the Federal Register at the same time that the social security increases are required to be published.