Text: H.R.2394 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 104-57 (11/22/1995)

 
[104th Congress Public Law 57]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


<DOC>
[DOCID: f:publ57.104]


[[Page 109 STAT. 555]]

Public Law 104-57
104th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To increase, effective as of December 1, 1995, the rates of compensation 
   for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of 
   dependency and indemnity compensation for the survivors of certain 
       disabled veterans. <<NOTE: Nov. 22, 1995 -  [H.R. 2394]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: Veterans' 
Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 1995.>> 

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. <<NOTE: 38 USC 101 note.>> 

    This Act may be cited as the ``Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living 
Adjustment Act of 1995''.

SEC. 2. <<NOTE: 38 USC 1114 note.>> INCREASE IN RATES OF DISABILITY 
            COMPENSATION AND DEPENDENCY AND INDEMNITY COMPENSATION.

    (a) Rate Adjustment.--The Secretary of Veterans Affairs shall, 
effective on December 1, 1995, increase the dollar amounts in effect for 
the payment of disability compensation and dependency and indemnity 
compensation by the Secretary, as specified in subsection (b).
    (b) Amounts To Be Increased.--The dollar amounts to be increased 
pursuant to subsection (a) are the following:
            (1) Compensation.--Each of the dollar amounts in effect 
        under section 1114 of title 38, United States Code.
            (2) Additional compensation for dependents.--Each of the 
        dollar amounts in effect under section 1115(1) of such title.
            (3) Clothing allowance.--The dollar amount in effect under 
        section 1162 of such title.
            (4) New dic rates.--The dollar amounts in effect under 
        paragraphs (1) and (2) of section 1311(a) of such title.
            (5) Old dic rates.--Each of the dollar amounts in effect 
        under section 1311(a)(3) of such title.
            (6) Additional dic for surviving spouses with minor 
        children.--The dollar amount in effect under section 1311(b) of 
        such title.
            (7) Additional dic for disability.--The dollar amounts in 
        effect under sections 1311(c) and 1311(d) of such title.
            (8) DIC for dependent children.--The dollar amounts in 
        effect under sections 1313(a) and 1314 of such title.

    (c) Determination of Percentage Increase.--(1) The increase under 
subsection (a) shall be made in the dollar amounts specified in 
subsection (b) as in effect on November 30, 1995. Each such amount shall 
be increased by the same percentage as the percentage by which benefit 
amounts payable under title II of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 401 
et seq.) are increased

[[Page 109 STAT. 556]]

effective December 1, 1995, as a result of a determination under section 
215(i) of such Act (42 U.S.C. 415(i)).
    (2) In the computation of increased dollar amounts pursuant to 
paragraph (1), any amount which as so computed is not an even multiple 
of $1 shall be rounded to the next lower whole dollar amount.
    (d) Special Rule.--The Secretary may adjust administratively, 
consistent with the increases made under subsection (a), the rates of 
disability compensation payable to persons within the purview of section 
10 of Public Law 85-857 (72 Stat. 1263) who are not in receipt of 
compensation payable pursuant to chapter 11 of title 38, United States 
Code.

SEC. 3. PUBLICATION OF ADJUSTED RATES. <<NOTE: Federal Register, 
            publication. 38 USC 1114 note.>> 

    At the same time as the matters specified in section 215(i)(2)(D) of 
the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 415(i)(2)(D)) are required to be 
published by reason of a determination made under section 215(i) of such 
Act during fiscal year 1996, the Secretary of Veterans Affairs shall 
publish in the Federal Register the amounts specified in section 2(b), 
as increased pursuant to section 2.

    Approved November 22, 1995.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 2394:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

HOUSE REPORTS: No. 104-273 (Comm. on Veterans' Affairs).
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 141 (1995):
            Oct. 10, considered and passed House.
            Nov. 9, considered and passed Senate, amended.
            Nov. 10, House concurred in Senate amendment.
WEEKLY COMPILATION OF PRESIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS, Vol. 31 (1995):
            Nov. 22, Presidential statement.

                                  <all>