Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/19/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/31/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 10/31/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 10/31/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 10/31/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/31/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/31/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/08/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/14/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 11/20/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 12/06/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 12/22/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 01/03/1996
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 01/31/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/31/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/01/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 02/27/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/27/1996
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/27/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/27/1996
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/13/1996
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/14/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/14/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/19/1996
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 05/07/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/29/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/06/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/06/1996
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 06/11/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/10/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/16/1996
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/24/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/05/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/05/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/05/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/12/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/12/1996
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/12/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 09/27/1996