Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/28/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 09/28/1995
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 10/10/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/10/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/10/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 10/10/1995
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/10/1995
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/10/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/18/1995
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 10/18/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/18/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 10/18/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/18/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/18/1995
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/18/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 10/18/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/18/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 10/26/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/01/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/08/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/08/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/10/1996