Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/29/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 10/11/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/17/1995
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/25/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/25/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 10/30/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/02/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/02/1995
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 11/07/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/07/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 11/10/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/10/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/14/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 12/13/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 12/13/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 12/13/1995
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 12/13/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/13/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 12/13/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/13/1995
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large] 12/13/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 12/13/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/13/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 12/15/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/15/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/15/1995
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 12/15/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 12/15/1995
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 12/15/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 12/15/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/15/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/15/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 12/15/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 12/15/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 12/15/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 12/15/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/15/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/15/1995
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 12/15/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 12/15/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 12/15/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/15/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 12/15/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/15/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 01/24/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 02/29/1996
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/29/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/29/1996