Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/19/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/19/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/19/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/19/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/19/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 10/19/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/19/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/19/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 10/19/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/19/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 10/19/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/19/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/19/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 10/19/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/19/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 10/19/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/19/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/19/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/26/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 10/26/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/26/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/26/1995
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 10/26/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/26/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 10/26/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/26/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/26/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/05/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 12/05/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 12/05/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 12/05/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/05/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 12/05/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 12/05/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 12/05/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 12/05/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 12/05/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 12/05/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 12/05/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 01/04/1996
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 01/04/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/04/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/04/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/28/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/28/1996