Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 09/29/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1]* 09/29/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 09/29/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/17/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/17/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/17/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/17/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 10/17/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/17/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 10/26/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/26/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/26/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/07/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 11/07/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/07/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 11/28/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 11/28/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/28/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 11/28/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/28/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/12/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/28/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/28/1996
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/28/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/28/1996
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 02/28/1996