Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 01/17/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/17/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/17/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 01/17/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/17/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/17/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/01/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/01/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/01/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/01/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/01/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/01/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/01/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 02/01/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/01/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/13/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 02/13/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 02/13/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/13/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/13/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/09/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/09/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/09/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/09/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/09/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 03/09/1995
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/09/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/16/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/16/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/16/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/24/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/24/1995
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/03/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 04/04/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 05/09/1995
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/21/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/10/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/10/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 03/28/1996